Full Text of HR1230 98th General Assembly
HR1230 98TH GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
| | HR1230 | | LRB098 22046 GRL 60914 r |
|
| 1 | | HOUSE RESOLUTION
| 2 | | WHEREAS, Glenn Poshard was born on October 30, 1945 in | 3 | | Herald; he is a 3-degree graduate of Southern Illinois | 4 | | University, having earned his bachelor's degree in secondary | 5 | | education in 1970, a master's degree in educational | 6 | | administration in 1974, and a Ph.D. in administration of higher | 7 | | education in 1984; and
| 8 | | WHEREAS, After college, Glenn Poshard taught high school, | 9 | | coached high school sports, and served as director of the | 10 | | Southern Illinois Educational Service Center in Benton from | 11 | | 1975 to 1982; and
| 12 | | WHEREAS, After serving in the Illinois State Senate from | 13 | | 1984 to 1988, Glenn Poshard served in the United States House | 14 | | of Representatives from January 3, 1989 to January 3, 1999; | 15 | | following his stint in Congress, he and his wife, Jo, founded | 16 | | the Poshard Foundation for Abused Children, which raises more | 17 | | than $100,000 annually to fund care for abused children and | 18 | | other victims of domestic abuse throughout southern Illinois; | 19 | | among its many activities, the Poshard Foundation led efforts | 20 | | to construct a new $600,000 women's shelter in Cairo, which | 21 | | opened in December of 2003; and
| 22 | | WHEREAS, Glenn Poshard served for 4 years as the Vice |
| | | HR1230 | - 2 - | LRB098 22046 GRL 60914 r |
|
| 1 | | Chancellor for Administration at Southern Illinois University | 2 | | Carbondale; in January of 2004, he was selected by Governor Rod | 3 | | Blagojevich to serve on the Southern Illinois University Board | 4 | | of Trustees; he was later elected Chairman of the Board of | 5 | | Trustees; in 2005, he resigned from his position on the Board | 6 | | of Trustees and announced his candidacy for the presidency of | 7 | | the Southern Illinois University system; on November 18, 2005, | 8 | | the Southern Illinois University Board of Trustees announced | 9 | | that they had selected Glenn Poshard to serve as President of | 10 | | the system; he subsequently took office on January 1, 2006; and
| 11 | | WHEREAS, On July 25, 2013, Glenn Poshard announced that | 12 | | would will retire as President of Southern Illinois University | 13 | | after the 2013-14 school year; and
| 14 | | WHEREAS, Glenn Poshard has served with dignity and | 15 | | integrity as President of Southern Illinois University; Mr. | 16 | | Poshard and his legacy of service stand as examples of great | 17 | | dedication and civic virtue to the citizens of the State of | 18 | | Illinois; therefore, be it
| 19 | | RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE | 20 | | NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that | 21 | | we congratulate Glenn Poshard on the occasion of his retirement | 22 | | and wish him continued success and happiness in the future; and | 23 | | be it further
|
| | | HR1230 | - 3 - | LRB098 22046 GRL 60914 r |
|
| 1 | | RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be | 2 | | presented to Glenn Poshard as a symbol of our esteem and | 3 | | respect.
|
|